U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CRAWFORD, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 20, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 22, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.