U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LLOYD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.