U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BARRIENTES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.