U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JUAREZ-ZAMUDIO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.