U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CUNNINGHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 28, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.