U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COLLINS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 22, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.