U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-mj-00058-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SOLOMKIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.