U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. EDWARDS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 11, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 11, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.