U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.