U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 08, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.