U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MITCHEM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 09, 2021: [Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.