U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HAMILTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 16, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.