U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DUNN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 19, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 16, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.