U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MORA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.