U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MATTOX
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.