U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MONTGOMERY, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Additional Motions]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 30, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.