U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LAMONS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 23, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.