U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 25, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.