U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PRIEST
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.