U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHARPE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.