U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CHAPMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.