U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARDEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.