U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PRICE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.