U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TAYLOR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 07, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.