U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TYLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.