U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ADDERLY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.