U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GUTHRIE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.