U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WALDEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.