U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MASI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.