U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SPANGLER, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.