U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HINKLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 25, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.