U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DUNN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.