U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. QUINTANILLA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2021: [Interpreter Appointed]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.