U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WHITE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.