U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TIDWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 29, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.