U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 26, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.