U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GUERRO, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 05, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.