U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00007-2
  • Case Name: USA v. GARCIA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.