U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TUCKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.