U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FARROW, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 27, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 26, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.