U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NETTLES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.