U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOWE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.