U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FUTRELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.