U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BONCIMINO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Surrender]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.