U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SUTHERLAND
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.