U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MERCERY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.