U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. VOLZ et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 04, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.