U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HILL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.