U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PIMENTEL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.