U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DE LA BRUYERE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.